MA S1349 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to regulate the use of unmanned aerial vehicles. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To regulate the use of unmanned aerial vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-26SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2017-05-22JointHearing scheduled for 05/31/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1345 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1330 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
H4517 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Published as amended, see H4539

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback