MA S132 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to preventing sexual abuse of children and youth by adults in positions of authority or trust. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to preventing sexual abuse of children and youth by adults in positions of authority or trust
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] |
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Rep. Bradford Hill [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-08-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S1007 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1009 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H241 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S929 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S924 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S369 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1801 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1092 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1009 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H241 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S929 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S924 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S369 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1801 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1092 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S132 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S132.pdf |