MA S1278 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kennedy, a petition of Thomas P. Kennedy and Louis L. Kafka to provide for investigating construction practices and their impact on firefighter deaths. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Resolve providing for investigating construction practices and their impact on firefighter deaths
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2016-03-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2016 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-06-04 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2015-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1865 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2088
S1141 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2294
S1174 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1478 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S851 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1436 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2306 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1264 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1179 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2211
S2327 (Similar To) 2016-06-15 - Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1141 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2294
S1174 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1478 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S851 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1436 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2306 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1264 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1179 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2211
S2327 (Similar To) 2016-06-15 - Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1278 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1278.pdf |