MA S1275 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require the Department of Public Health to conduct a study of the health impacts of airplane flights on the resident communities that are represented on the Massachusetts Port Authority Community Advisory Committee. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require the Department of Public Health to conduct a study of the health impacts of airplane flights on the resident communities that are represented on the Massachusetts Port Authority Community Advisory Committee

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2017-12-07JointHearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-12-05JointHearing scheduled for 12/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1172 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S701 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S227 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1932 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2410 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback