MA S1255 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2422
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to find the best practices to promote education, awareness, and prevention of Lyme disease. Public Health.
Title
Establishing a special commission to find the best practices to promote education, awareness, and prevention of Lyme disease
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Sen. Thomas McGee [D] | Rep. Daniel Donahue [D] |
Rep. James Cantwell [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2422 |
2017-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1861 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1303 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S38 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S304 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
S208 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1707 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2075 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1314 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H291 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2422 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Reported (in part) by S1241
H4922 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Resolves of 2018
S1303 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S38 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S304 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
S208 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1707 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2075 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1314 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H291 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2422 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Reported (in part) by S1241
H4922 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Resolves of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1255 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1255.pdf |