MA S1227 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance sexual assault evidence kit collection. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the sexual assault nurse examiner program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
H1912 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4446
S736 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
H3330 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1436 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1307 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2692
S844 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2491
S988 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S980 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1912 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4446
S736 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
H3330 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1436 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1307 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2692
S844 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2491
S988 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S980 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1227 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1227.pdf |