MA S1192 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2691
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to wrongful discharge from employment. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to wrongful discharge from employment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2691 |
2021-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H2049 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S1908 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H1984 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1164
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
H4097 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4297
H4124 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4622
H1088 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
S1178 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1169 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2697
S1840 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2691 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1950 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1908 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H1984 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1164
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
H4097 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4297
H4124 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4622
H1088 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
S1178 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1169 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2697
S1840 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2691 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1950 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1192 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1192.pdf |