MA H1950 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2721

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to wage transparency. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to wage transparency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-03SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2721
2021-06-08JointHearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
S1908 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
H4097 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4297
H4124 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4622
H1984 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1164
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1169 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2697
S1192 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1189 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied H2046
S2721 (Replaced by) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback