MA S1166 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2722
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide bereavement leave to employees in Massachusetts. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To provide bereavement leave to employees in Massachusetts
Sponsors
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
Rep. Russell Holmes [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2722 |
2021-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2061 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3114 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2582 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H561 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1169 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2697
S1160 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1159 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2722 (Replaced by) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1976 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2722
H3114 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2582 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H561 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1169 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2697
S1160 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1159 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2722 (Replaced by) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1976 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2722
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1166 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1166.pdf |