MA S1164 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2046
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-03 - Accompanied H2046
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-03 - Accompanied H2046
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to assess the Commonwealth’s eye care and vision health needs. Public Health.
Title
To assess the Commonwealth’s eye care and vision health needs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-03 | House | Accompanied H2046 |
2015-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 02:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2046 (Replaced by) 2016-05-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1222 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied H2007
S224 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Discharged from a part of S2215 to the committee on Senate Rules
S325 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2344
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S859 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S626 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H2850 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2022 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3183 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S1222 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied H2007
S224 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Discharged from a part of S2215 to the committee on Senate Rules
S325 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2344
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S859 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S626 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H2850 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2022 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3183 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1164 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1164.pdf |