MA S116 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2917
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to eligibility for disability services. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to eligibility for disability services
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2917 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-11-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H179 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4547
H752 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Accompanied S405
H4053 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4012
S903 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S70 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2917 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H752 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Accompanied S405
H4053 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4012
S903 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S70 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2917 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S116 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S116.pdf |