MA H752 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Accompanied S405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Accompanied S405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Peake of Provincetown, a petition of Sarah K. Peake and others that persons diagnosed with HIV or AIDS be eligible for home care to be administered by the Executive Office of Elder Affairs. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to Massachusetts home care eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Senate | Accompanied S405 |
2021-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S405 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H752 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H752.pdf |