MA S1153 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to safely reduce the use of cash bail. The Judiciary.
Title
To safely reduce the use of cash bail
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2665 |
2021-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S572 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S494
S1465 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S525 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2895
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H4119 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H1577 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H274 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S1465 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S525 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2895
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H4119 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H1577 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H274 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1153 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1153.pdf |