MA S1120 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2541
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the repayment of student loans for mental and behavioral healthcare workers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the repayment of student loans for mental and behavioral healthcare workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2541 |
2019-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-04-08 | House | House concurred |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H998 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3977
S2541 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H998 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3977
S2541 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1120 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1120.pdf |