MA S1090 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2778

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish collective bargaining rights for TNC drivers. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing collective bargaining rights for TNC drivers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2778
2020-02-05SenateSenate concurred
2020-01-30HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-05-24JointHearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1664 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S111 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2894
H2960 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1596 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
S1190 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S2103 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3855 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Adopted, see H3854
H3854 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2019
S2282 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2778 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback