MA S1066 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2612
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to address leaving the scene of an accident resulting in death aka Katie Brienzo's Law. The Judiciary.
Title
To address leaving the scene of an accident resulting in death aka Katie Brienzo's Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2612 |
2023-12-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1637 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
S2612 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Reported (in part) S2538
S2612 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Reported (in part) S2538
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1066 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1066.pdf |