MA S1065 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2716
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to nondiscrimination. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to nondiscrimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2716 |
2019-06-21 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H900 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
H1401 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1481 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S24 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2294
S1100 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2716 (Replaced by) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
H1401 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1481 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S24 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2294
S1100 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2716 (Replaced by) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1065 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1065.pdf |