MA S1065 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2488
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen local control over recreational marijuana businesses. Marijuana Policy.
Title
Strengthening local control over recreational marijuana businesses
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] |
Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D] | Sen. Michael Rush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2488 |
2018-01-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2018 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A1 & A2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H3168 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H2380 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1634 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3667
H3667 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H189 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2488 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2380 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1634 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3667
H3667 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H189 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2488 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1065 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1065.pdf |