MA H3667 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1634
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to local control of boat excise revenue
Title
Relative to local control of boat excise revenue
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-05-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-05-04 | House | New draft of H1634 |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1634 (Replaces) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3667
H3168 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H2380 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S1065 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
H189 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3168 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H2380 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S1065 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
H189 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3667 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3667.pdf |