MA S1056 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2066
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-10 - Accompanied H2066
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-10 - Accompanied H2066
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to healthy cleaning products in schools. Public Health.
Title
Relative to healthy schools
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. Ellen Story [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Sen. Linda Forry [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | House | Accompanied H2066 |
2013-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 09:30 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2066 (Replaced by) 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4234
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1056 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1056.pdf |