MA S1048 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a family and medical leave insurance program. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a family and medical leave insurance program

Sponsors

Sen. Karen Spilka [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Solomon Goldstein-Rose [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. Jay Kaufman [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Sen. Thomas McGee [D]Rep. John Scibak [D]
Rep. Byron Rushing [D]Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Sen. William Brownsberger [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]
Sen. Mark Montigny [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Evandro Carvalho [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]
Sen. Cynthia Creem [D]Sen. Michael Rush [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]
Rep. James Miceli [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Thomas Calter [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Paul Heroux [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Sen. Eric Lesser [D]Rep. Juana Matias [D]
Rep. James Murphy [D]Sen. James Timilty [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Sen. Linda Forry [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Sen. Adam Hinds [D]Sen. Jennifer Flanagan [D]
Sen. James Welch [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13JointHearing rescheduled to 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-05-31JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S578 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:30 PM in 437
S579 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1385 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
H626 (Similar To) 2017-04-18 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H109 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H34 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Senate concurred
H497 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback