MA S1046 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2753

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2753
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent human trafficking and improve the health and safety of sex workers. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent human trafficking and improve the health and safety of sex workers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-02SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2753
2024-04-16HouseHouse concurred
2024-03-28SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-05-09JointHearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2753 (Replaced by) 2024-05-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1736 (Similar To) 2023-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2458
H1758 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback