MA H1758 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4831
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent human trafficking and improve the health and safety of sex workers. The Judiciary.
Title
To prevent human trafficking and improve the health and safety of sex workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4831 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1046 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2753
H2009 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
H513 (Similar To) 2024-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2619
S364 (Similar To) 2023-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3929
S1341 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
H4831 (Replaced by) 2024-07-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2009 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
H513 (Similar To) 2024-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2619
S364 (Similar To) 2023-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3929
S1341 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
H4831 (Replaced by) 2024-07-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1758 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1758.pdf |