MA S1046 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to negligent and reckless driving. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to negligent and reckless driving
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2665 |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2348 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3631 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1652 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S576 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1574 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
H1742 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1737 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1740 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2353 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1591 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2889
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1647 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H2541 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5320
H1922 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3631 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1652 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S576 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1574 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
H1742 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1737 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1740 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2353 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1591 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2889
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1647 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H2541 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5320
H1922 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1046 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1046.pdf |