MA S104 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2846
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2846
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2846
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Commonwealth of Massachusetts to establish additional mandated reporters for the purpose of the protection and care of children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To authorize the Commonwealth of Massachusetts to establish additional mandated reporters for the purpose of the protection and care of children
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2846 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-27 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1004 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3665 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2417 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2846 (Replaced by) 2022-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1106 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
H624 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
S1004 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3665 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2417 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2846 (Replaced by) 2022-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1106 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
H624 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S104 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S104.pdf |