MA S1035 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3063
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S3063
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S3063
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to treatment, not imprisonment. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to treatment, not imprisonment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S3063 |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-25 | House | Amendment (changing reporting date to Friday July 29, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday July 22, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-06-30 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-14 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1462 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5205
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2543 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2580 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1460 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2098 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
S1278 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1259 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
S1268 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1296 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1305 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S1219 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1000 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2584 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
S3063 (Replaced by) 2022-08-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2543 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2580 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1460 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2098 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
S1278 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1259 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
S1268 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1296 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1305 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S1219 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1000 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2584 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
S3063 (Replaced by) 2022-08-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1035 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1035.pdf |