MA S1032 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4272
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Hedlund, a petition of Robert L. Hedlund and David F. DeCoste foe legislation to ban the prescription of opoids in the Commonwealth. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
Banning the prescription of opoids in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4272 |
2015-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
H4272 (Replaced by) 2016-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S362 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2316
S1045 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1040 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S639 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S301 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S1855 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2125 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2020 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S1015 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S569 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S362 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2316
S1045 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1040 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S639 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S301 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S1855 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2125 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2020 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S1015 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S569 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1032 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1032.pdf |