MA S1022 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2114
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a state health service corps within the Executive Office of Health and Human Services to ensure the quality, affordability and access to primary and preventive health care throughout the Commonwealth . Public Health.
Title
To ensure quality, affordability and access to primary and preventive health care, to eliminate health disparities, and to enhance economic growth throughout the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. John Hart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2114 |
2013-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2114 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1022 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1022.pdf |