MA S1 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
In Joint Session, January 5, 2023 -- Communication from Her Excellency the Governor, Maura T. Healey, submitting her inaugural address
Title
Governor Healey's Inaugural Address
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Senate | Placed on file |
Same As/Similar To
S2 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Placed on file
S2482 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2548
H4759 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4849
H4935 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - See H4800
H4934 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Governor's amendment adopted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 170 )
S2482 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2548
H4759 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4849
H4935 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - See H4800
H4934 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Governor's amendment adopted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 170 )
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1.pdf |