MA H999 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4595
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4595
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4595
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing an invasive species trust fund and responses to threats of invasive species. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Responding to the threat of invasive species
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4595 |
2021-11-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S563 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4595
H4595 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4595 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H999 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H999.pdf |