MA H98 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing Trevor J. Seaboyer to take the civil service examination for the position of firefighter in the city of Haverhill, notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing Trevor J. Seaboyer to take the civil service examination for the position of firefighter in the city of Haverhill notwithstanding the maximum age requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-06-07 | House | Enacted |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-05-06 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-04-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-04-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/20/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S44 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1697 (Similar To) 2022-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 281 of the Acts of 2022
S1698 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2498 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2022
S1697 (Similar To) 2022-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 281 of the Acts of 2022
S1698 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2498 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H98 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H98.pdf |