MA H975 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Massachusetts public bank. Financial Services.
Title
To establish a Massachusetts public bank
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 17, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4632 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4785 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4785 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H975 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H975.pdf |