MA H972 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4705
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4705
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4705
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require financial institutions to pay late fees upon failure to conduct electronic transfers. Financial Services.
Title
To require financial institutions to pay late fees when it fails to conduct an electronic transfer
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4705 |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4705 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H972 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H972.pdf |