MA H940 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase limits of liability bonds and policies to protect consumers involved in motor vehicle collisions. Financial Services.
Title
To increase limits of liability bonds and policies to protect consumers involved in motor vehicle collisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S185 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S120 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H54 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3966 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S120 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H54 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3966 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H940 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H940.pdf |