MA H862 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to protecting coastal communities. Environment and Natural Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to protecting coastal communities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-10JointHearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources

Same As/Similar To

S2736 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2755 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2833 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4798 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Adopted, in concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback