MA H854 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5124
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to industrial wastewater discharge of dental facilities. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to industrial wastewater discharge of dental facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5124 |
2019-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H222 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H861 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H752 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S455 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
H5124 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H861 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H752 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S455 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
H5124 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H854 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H854.pdf |