MA H222 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to water treatment and wastewater plants and systems. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative water treatment and wastewater treatment facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cutler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H752 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2763 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1918 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S538 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2763 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1918 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S538 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H222 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H222.pdf |