MA H850 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to mosquito control and aerial spraying. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to mosquito control
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H850 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H850.pdf |