MA H830 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Mark of Peru, a petition of Paul W. Mark and Michael J. Soter that the Department of Environmental Protection be required to report violations of standards or regulations regulating the quality of water used for drinking, domestic or culinary purposes to the Department of Public Health. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to water supply records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H193 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied S112
H1841 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2241 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H2011 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1970 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1311 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S1141 (Similar To) 2019-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1285 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1706 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S962 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback