MA H812 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the identification requirements for certain voters. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Massachusetts voter identification law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H3828 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - New draft substituted, see H4793
H788 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S28 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Hearing scheduled from 03/4/2021 @ 4:00 PM until 03/08/2021 @ 10:00 AM in Written Testimony Only
S464 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2049 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H3935 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2022
H3950 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3983 (Similar To) 2021-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2530 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2713
S448 (Similar To) 2021-06-19 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H784 (Similar To) 2021-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S458 (Similar To) 2021-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S435 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S485 (Similar To) 2021-06-19 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S457 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S476 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback