MA H784 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5026
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a fund for special elections to fill vacancies in the offices of senator or representative in the General Court. Election Laws.
Title
Authorizing the establishment of a special election guarantee fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5026 |
2021-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3162 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
S2048 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2107 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S17 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3171 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
S2048 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2107 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S17 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3171 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H784 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H784.pdf |