MA H767 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4408
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-04 - New draft substituted, see H4408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-04 - New draft substituted, see H4408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the membership of the Middlesex Canal Commission. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the Middlesex Canal Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | House | New draft substituted, see H4408 |
2014-09-04 | House | Read second, amendment adopted (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2014-09-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2014-08-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2014-08-18 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4408 |
2014-06-09 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-04-03 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2013-05-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2013-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4408 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H767 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H767.pdf |