MA H757 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to criminal offender record information. The Judiciary.
Title
Providing for the distribution of information on personal rights and resources be provided to those in the Criminal Offender Record Information (CORI) system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S149 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1367 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H890 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2001 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1718 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S2091 (Similar To) 2017-06-21 - See H3731
H4812 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2018
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1367 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H890 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2001 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1718 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S2091 (Similar To) 2017-06-21 - See H3731
H4812 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2018
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H757 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H757.pdf |