MA H738 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to threats posed by nuclear weapons and climate change. Emergency Preparedness and Management.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to the existential threats posed by nuclear weapons and climate change to the commonwealth of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 15, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Emergency Preparedness and Management |
Same As/Similar To
S1488 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H738 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H738.pdf |