MA H737 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S774 and S800
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the rate setting processes for home health and home care services. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying rate setting processes for home health and home care services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-31SenateAccompanied S774 and S800
2021-06-30JointHearing scheduled for 07/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-03SenateSenate concurred
2021-05-27HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S774 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S739 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2143 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1951 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback