MA H727 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4874

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to opioid abuse. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To fight opioid abuse

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4874
2017-08-31JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S275 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
H2390 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H345 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H109 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback