MA H67 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a special municipal election for a vacancy in the office of Mayor in the city of Boston. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the office of Mayor in the city of Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-02-25 | House | Enacted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2021-02-22 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
2021-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
Same As/Similar To
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H2942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
H3914 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 109 of the Acts of 2022
S2523 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2022
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H3221 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5334
H847 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3395 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S2024 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S1367 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - New draft (Velis) substituted, see S2523
H2942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
H3914 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 109 of the Acts of 2022
S2523 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2022
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H3221 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5334
H847 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3395 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S2024 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S1367 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - New draft (Velis) substituted, see S2523
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H67 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H67.pdf |