MA H650 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the option of providing basic common sense health services for residents of assisted living residences. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing common sense health services in assisted living

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-21SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2527
2023-03-31JointHearing scheduled for 04/10/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S374 (Similar To) 2023-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
S2527 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback