MA H647 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to choosing presidential electors and the process which governors them. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to how Electoral College votes are delegated

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H684 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H705 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H717 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H653 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S386 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S12 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
S405 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S406 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H3856 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback