MA H623 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing spouses to be caregivers in the adult foster care and personal attendant programs. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing spouses as caregivers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H2542 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2264 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2657 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2608 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S727 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S28 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1506 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1515 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1483 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S879 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1575 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback